+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a8822b
On June 16, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading 6630b
On June 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- Amended on third reading 6630a
On May 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On May 14, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On May 13, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.624
On February 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to environmental conservation
+ − Vote
May 13, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Environmental Conservation - May 13, 2014
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 2
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- George Latimer: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Elizabeth Little: yea
- Carl L Marcellino: nay
- George D. Maziarz: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Jose M. Serrano: nay
- Cecilia Tkaczyk: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor