+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On June 9, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Real Property Taxation
On June 9, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.692
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
June 8, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 7
May 28, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor