+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.567
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (2)
May 17, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 58
- Present/NV: 5
April 11, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 13