+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (20)
On November 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.332
On October 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On May 22, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.923
- Substituted For A9586
On May 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On April 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 23, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.848
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Veterans' Affairs
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1825
On June 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (4)
May 15, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Veterans, Homeland Security And Military Affairs)
- Yeas: 12
June 15, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor