+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.699
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Cities
+ − Votes (2)
May 11, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 57
- Present/NV: 6
May 4, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Cities)
- Yeas: 7