+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On May 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.562
On January 27, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
May 4, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Present/NV: 4
April 11, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor