+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.239
- Substituted For A7326a
On June 2, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1892
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 27, 2022 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6541a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Health
+ − Votes (4)
June 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Absent: 1
June 2, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 3, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 19, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Health)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor