+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.184
On September 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On July 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.309
- Substituted For A7805c
On July 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.798
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On June 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6523a
- Amend And Recommit To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
July 22, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
July 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19