+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On March 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 14, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.700
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Higher Education
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1500
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Higher Education
+ − Votes (5)
March 24, 2022: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
March 14, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 11
June 7, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
June 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
May 11, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Higher Education)
- Yeas: 11