+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On May 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.226
On January 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
May 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
February 24, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor