+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 20, 2014 in the Senate:
- Substituted by a9154a
On June 9, 2014 in the Senate:
- Advanced to third reading
On June 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- 2nd report cal.
On June 2, 2014 in the Senate:
- 1st report cal.1102
On May 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- Print number 6507a
- Amend and recommit to insurance
On January 31, 2014 in the Senate:
- Referred to insurance
+ − Vote
June 2, 2014: COMMITTEE VOTE: - Insurance - Jun 2, 2014
- Yeas: 19
Details:
+
−
- Tony Avella: yea
- Neil D. Breslin: yea
- David Carlucci: yea
- Adriano Espaillat: yea
- John J. Flanagan: yea
- Martin J. Golden: yea
- Mark Grisanti: yea
- Timothy M. Kennedy: yea
- Andrew J. Lanza: yea
- William J. Larkin Jr.: yea
- Kenneth P. LaValle: yea
- Jack M. Martins: yea
- Ted O'Brien: yea
- Thomas F. O'Mara: yea
- Kevin S. Parker: yea
- José Peralta: yea
- James L. Seward: yea
- Toby Ann Stavisky: yea
- Catharine Young: yea
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor