+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On October 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.357
On October 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.531
- Substituted For A8289
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1647
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor