+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.266
On August 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.2136
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Substituted For A8090b
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.656
- Home Rule Request
- Home Rule Request
- Passed Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6499b
- Amend And Recommit To Rules
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6499a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 21, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 21, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Absent: 1
June 6, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor