+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (21)
On June 2, 2022 in the Senate:
- Reference Changed To Energy And Telecommunications
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1923
- Substituted By A7389c
On March 21, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
- Print Number 6486d
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amend And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
- Print Number 6486c
On January 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died In Assembly
- Returned To Senate
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate
- Delivered To Assembly
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1564
On June 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
- Print Number 6486b
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Environmental Conservation
- Print Number 6486a
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Votes (3)
June 2, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 6
- Absent: 1
June 8, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 27
June 7, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor