+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (8)
On July 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Election Law
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.258
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Elections
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
July 21, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 20
January 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Elections)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor