+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8300a
On July 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.795
On July 20, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On February 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6459a
- Amend And Recommit To Civil Service And Pensions
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Civil Service And Pensions
On June 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (3)
July 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 23
July 21, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
July 20, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Civil Service And Pensions)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor