+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.611
On November 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.514
- Substituted For A7756a
- Referred To Codes
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1634
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor