+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On March 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On January 28, 2022 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Opinion Referred To Judiciary
On May 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- To Attorney-general For Opinion
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor