+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On September 29, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.216
On September 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.302
- Substituted For A10082
On May 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Education
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.561
On January 13, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
May 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 54
- Present/NV: 8
- Absent: 1
April 11, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor