+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6438b
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6438a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1632
On June 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62