+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On December 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Vetoed Memo.232
On December 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.608
- Substituted For A8060a
On June 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1531
On June 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6427a
- Amend And Recommit To Rules
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 3
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 18