+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7272
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1092
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Housing, Construction And Community Development
+ − Vote
May 18, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Housing, Construction And Community Development)
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 3