+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (20)
On April 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.54
On April 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Message Of Necessity - 3 Day Message
- Motion To Postpone Lost
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.30
- Substituted For A9006c
- Referred To Ways And Means
On April 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On March 31, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6406c
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.522
- Message Of Necessity - 3 Day Message
- Delivered To Assembly
On March 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6406b
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On February 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6406a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Finance
On January 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (2)
March 31, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 37
March 31, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 1