+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On April 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.858
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1017
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Codes
+ − Votes (4)
April 30, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 5
April 30, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 16
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 14
May 16, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Codes)
- Yeas: 14
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor