+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.60
- Signed Chap.496
On December 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.457
- Substituted For A8257a
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6369a
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1324
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor