+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On September 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.422
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.476
- Substituted For A7434a
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1498
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6350a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (3)
June 10, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 47
- Nays: 16
June 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 5
May 10, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor