+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On June 8, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6341b
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On March 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6341a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Local Government
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 2
May 16, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (25)
Type:
Primary Sponsor