+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (11)
On August 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.232
On August 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.432
- Substituted For A8225
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1621
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Rules
+ − Votes (2)
June 18, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 18, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor