+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (14)
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A8288b
On January 17, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended (t) 6335c
On January 9, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.96
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6335b
- Amend And Recommit To Energy And Telecommunications
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 6335a
On June 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1356
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (2)
January 9, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 11
May 24, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor