+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On August 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.366
On July 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.673
- Substituted For A7030
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1497
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 8, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Nays: 1
June 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 21
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor