+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (15)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.473
On September 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.431
- Substituted For A4950a
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.925
On April 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6321a
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (2)
May 20, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 4, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor