+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Governmental Operations
On June 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6315a
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.810
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Finance
+ − Votes (2)
June 16, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 10, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor