+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On May 17, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
On May 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.864
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
On January 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
On June 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1133
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 12, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred To Alcoholism And Drug Abuse
+ − Votes (5)
May 17, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 2
June 9, 2015: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 59
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 23
- Present/NV: 2
May 12, 2015: Committee Vote (Senate Alcoholism And Drug Abuse)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor