+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On December 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.86
- Signed Chap.711
On December 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.474
- Substituted For A7381a
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 6294a
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1025
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Disabilities
+ − Votes (3)
June 7, 2021: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 3
May 11, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Finance)
- Yeas: 20
- Nays: 3
May 3, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Disabilities)
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor