+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On May 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A7063a
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 6291a
On May 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1041
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Environmental Conservation
+ − Vote
May 3, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Environmental Conservation)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor