+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On June 3, 2022 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On January 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On January 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.318
On January 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Vote
January 24, 2022: Committee Vote (Senate Judiciary)
- Yeas: 13
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor