+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned To Assembly
- Repassed Senate
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading (t) 6278a
- Vote Reconsidered - Restored To Third Reading
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Recalled From Assembly
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 22, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1185
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1123
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (4)
June 18, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 4, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 63
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor