+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (5)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On March 28, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On March 23, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On March 22, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.399
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Vote
March 22, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor