+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 17, 2016 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6270a
On April 11, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On April 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On April 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.528
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Vote
April 5, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor