+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A268a
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6267a
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1079
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Vote
May 18, 2021: Committee Vote (Senate Consumer Protection)
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor