+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Local Governments
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On June 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1294
On May 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6251a
- Amend And Recommit To Local Government
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Local Government
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Local Government)
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor