+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 9, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Ways And Means
On June 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1498
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On April 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6250a
- Amend And Recommit To Finance
On April 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Finance
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Energy And Telecommunications
+ − Votes (3)
June 9, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 2
June 7, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
April 12, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Energy And Telecommunications)
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor