+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (15)
On March 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On March 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On February 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On February 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On February 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.357
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1365
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
March 3, 2020: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
February 4, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 15
June 13, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
June 13, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor