+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Codes
On June 15, 2016 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On May 16, 2016 in the Senate:
- Amended On Third Reading 6222c
On May 10, 2016 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 9, 2016 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.714
On March 21, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6222b
- Amend And Recommit To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6222a
- Amend And Recommit To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
On January 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- Referred To Crime Victims, Crime And Correction
+ − Votes (2)
June 15, 2016: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 1
May 5, 2016: Committee Vote (Senate Crime Victims, Crime And Correction)
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2