+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (12)
On June 20, 2018 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1453
On February 15, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6220a
- Amend And Recommit To Education
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
On June 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Committed To Rules
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1179
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Education
+ − Votes (2)
May 31, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 17
- Present/NV: 1
- Absent: 1
May 23, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Education)
- Yeas: 19