+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 13, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 13, 2018 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1760
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On January 26, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6201a
- Amend And Recommit To Judiciary
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
On January 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1664
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (4)
June 13, 2018: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
June 13, 2018: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 15, 2017: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 60
- Present/NV: 3
June 14, 2017: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 25
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor