+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (14)
On December 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approval Memo.92
- Signed Chap.746
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.440
- Substituted For A492
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Insurance
On June 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
On May 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.990
On May 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Insurance
+ − Votes (2)
June 13, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 62
May 29, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Insurance)
- Yeas: 11