+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (18)
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Substituted By A9056
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported And Committed To Rules
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.81
On January 10, 2020 in the Senate:
- Print Number 6193c
- Amend And Recommit To Transportation
On January 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Died In Assembly
On January 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
- Amend (t) And Recommit To Transportation
- Print Number 6193b
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Transportation
On June 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Advanced To Third Reading
On June 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- 2nd Report Cal.
- Amended 6193a
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- 1st Report Cal.1091
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Transportation
+ − Votes (4)
January 13, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 19
January 13, 2020: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 15
June 6, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 61
- Present/NV: 1
May 30, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Transportation)
- Yeas: 15
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor