+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 31, 2018 in the Senate:
- Print Number 618c
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On January 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
On June 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 618b
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Print Number 618a
- Amend And Recommit To Consumer Protection
On January 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred To Consumer Protection
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor