+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (13)
On December 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Signed Chap.712
On December 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Governor
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Returned To Senate
- Passed Assembly
- Home Rule Request
- Ordered To Third Reading Rules Cal.516
- Substituted For A7776
On June 17, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred To Judiciary
On June 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Delivered To Assembly
- Passed Senate
On June 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered To Third Reading Cal.1204
- Committee Discharged And Committed To Rules
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred To Judiciary
+ − Votes (2)
June 17, 2019: Floor Vote (Senate)
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 6
June 5, 2019: Committee Vote (Senate Rules)
- Yeas: 18
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor